NY A01601 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the director of the division of veterans affairs to develop a program relating to veteran educational speakers; requires distribution of informational pamphlet to schools describing program and containing names of area veterans willing to speak to students regarding their military service experience.
Title
Directs the director of the division of veterans affairs to develop a program relating to veteran educational speakers; requires distribution of informational pamphlet to schools describing program and containing names of area veterans willing to speak to students regarding their military service experience.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.183 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1208 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5030 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.345 |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | print number 1601a |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S05030 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1601A