NY A01601 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the assent of a two-thirds majority of the members elected to each branch of the legislature prior to the immediate vote on any legislation which has not aged for three days; establishes further provisions relating to message of necessity legislation.
Title
Requires the assent of a two-thirds majority of the members elected to each branch of the legislature prior to the immediate vote on any legislation which has not aged for three days; establishes further provisions relating to message of necessity legislation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01086 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -