NY A01629 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Title
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01959 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY