NY A01639 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - print number 1639b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - print number 1639b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Clinton county's authorization to impose an additional 1% rate of sales and compensating use tax through November 30, 2022.
Title
Extends Clinton county's authorization to impose an additional 1% rate of sales and compensating use tax through November 30, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Assembly | print number 1639b |
2020-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-02 | Assembly | print number 1639a |
2019-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04198 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4198A