NY A01641 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - signed chap.416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - signed chap.416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires campaign finance information of certain candidates or committees to be filed on an electronic reporting system.
Title
Requires campaign finance information of certain candidates or committees to be filed on an electronic reporting system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | Senate | signed chap.416 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.616 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3903 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.149 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03903 (Same As) 2019-10-28 - signed chap.416