NY A01646 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful occupation; provides that if any dwelling or structure be occupied in violation of section three hundred two of the multiple residence law, no rent shall be recovered by the owner of such premises for said period, and no action for possession of said premises for nonpayment of such rent shall be maintained therefor.
Title
Relates to unlawful occupation; provides that if any dwelling or structure be occupied in violation of section three hundred two of the multiple residence law, no rent shall be recovered by the owner of such premises for said period, and no action for possession of said premises for nonpayment of such rent shall be maintained therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Senate | signed chap.444 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.643 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2576 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.280 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02576 (Same As) 2019-11-06 - signed chap.444