NY A01647 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants a real property tax exemption, at the option of the local taxing authority, to nonprofit organizations that purchase real property after the particular municipality's levy of taxes or taxable status date if the organization files an application for exemption with the assessor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants a real property tax exemption, at the option of the local taxing authority, to nonprofit organizations that purchase real property after the particular municipality's levy of taxes or taxable status date if the organization files an application for exemption with the assessor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.358
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.558
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2273
2018-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.976
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-01-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-12Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S02273 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1647

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01647&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01647&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01647
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01647&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01647&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01647&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01647&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1647#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback