NY A01656 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the rescued animals spay and neuter fund; authorizes the department of taxation and finance to place a check-off box on income tax returns for taxpayers to contribute money to the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the rescued animals spay and neuter fund; authorizes the department of taxation and finance to place a check-off box on income tax returns for taxpayers to contribute money to the fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.67
2019-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.67
2019-06-05Assemblyreported
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S00608 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback