NY A01679 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an employer may not take retaliatory action against a person who protests against or discloses any bribery or attempted bribery of a public official.
Title
Provides that an employer may not take retaliatory action against a person who protests against or discloses any bribery or attempted bribery of a public official.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 1679a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02832 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to labor