NY A01683 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to electronic delivery of property/casualty insurance notices and posting property/casualty insurance policies on the internet; authorizes electronic delivery of insurance notices with consent and the posting of policies on the internet if certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to electronic delivery of property/casualty insurance notices and posting property/casualty insurance policies on the internet; authorizes electronic delivery of insurance notices with consent and the posting of policies on the internet if certain conditions are met.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.271
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1384
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2526B
2018-06-18SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-18Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblyrepassed assembly
2018-06-11Assemblyamended on third reading 1683b
2018-06-11Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2018-06-11AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11Senaterecalled from senate
2018-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.35
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.35
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-17Assemblyprint number 1683a
2018-05-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to insurance
2017-01-12Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S02526 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1683B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01683
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01683A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01683B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01683&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1683#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback