NY A01712 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-05 - print number 1712d
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-05 - print number 1712d
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.
Title
Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-05 | Assembly | print number 1712d |
2012-12-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | print number 1712c |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | print number 1712b |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2012-01-06 | Assembly | print number 1712a |
2012-01-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01974 (Same As) 2012-11-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1974D