NY A01743 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - print number 1743a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - print number 1743a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Safe Streets Security Camera Registry Act" for the city of New York.
Title
Enacts the "Safe Streets Security Camera Registry Act" for the city of New York.
Sponsors
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Assembly | print number 1743a |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S00487 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 487A