NY A01746 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - substituted by s3971b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence, robotics and automation; and repeals such commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence, robotics and automation; and repeals such commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03Assemblysubstituted by s3971b
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.481
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-13Assemblyprint number 1746c
2019-05-13Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-05-08Assemblyprint number 1746b
2019-05-08Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-04-16Assemblyprint number 1746a
2019-04-16Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-01-16Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S03971 (Same As) 2019-07-24 - SIGNED CHAP.110

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01746&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01746&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01746
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01746&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01746A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01746&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01746B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01746&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01746C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01746&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01746&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback