NY A01749 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-11)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing for the reduction or revocation of the public pension of a public officer; authorizes the court to determine whether to reduce or revoke such pension based on the defined terms, and to consider and determine specific findings as to the amount of such forfeiture, if any, and whether forfeiture in whole or in part would result in undue hardship or other inequity upon any dependent children, spouse or other dependents; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to providing for the reduction or revocation of the public pension of a public officer; authorizes the court to determine whether to reduce or revoke such pension based on the defined terms, and to consider and determine specific findings as to the amount of such forfeiture, if any, and whether forfeiture in whole or in part would result in undue hardship or other inequity upon any dependent children, spouse or other dependents; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable Correction Date:01/27/2017 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable Correction Date:01/27/2017 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | opinion referred to judiciary |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | delivered to secretary of state |
2017-01-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.54 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S418 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.15 |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.15 |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00418 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1749