NY A01762 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to siting requirements for the New York city school construction authority's leasing program.
Title
Relates to siting requirements for the New York city school construction authority's leasing program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.77 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.162 |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03438 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS