NY A01762 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires legislative approval for the closure of correctional facilities and institutions.
Title
Requires legislative approval for the closure of correctional facilities and institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Assembly | held for consideration in correction |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01085 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES