NY A01772 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.590
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.590
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the assessment of a banking institution's record of performance to be in writing detailing the record of performance in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.
Title
Requires the assessment of a banking institution's record of performance to be in writing detailing the record of performance in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.590 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.96 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a1772a |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3227A |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.649 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3227a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.96 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.96 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1772a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S03227 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.590