NY A01779 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Identifies the criteria the commissioner of environmental conservation should consider in publishing a list of high local environmental impact zones; provides that high local environmental impact zones are areas most adversely affected by existing environmental hazards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identifies the criteria the commissioner of environmental conservation should consider in publishing a list of high local environmental impact zones; provides that high local environmental impact zones are areas most adversely affected by existing environmental hazards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-30Senate3RD READING CAL.74
2019-04-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S181
2019-04-30SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.180
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-01-29Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-17Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S00181 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1779

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01779
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1779#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback