NY A01801 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s4166a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the observance of September 11th Remembrance Day and provides for a brief period of silence on such day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the observance of September 11th Remembrance Day and provides for a brief period of silence on such day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s4166a
2019-06-12Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 1801b
2019-06-12Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-06-12AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12Senaterecalled from senate
2019-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.97
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.97
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-30Assemblyprint number 1801a
2019-05-30Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2019-01-17Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S04166 (Same As) 2019-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.248

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01801&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01801&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01801
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01801&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01801A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01801&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01801B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01801&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01801&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01801&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback