NY A01845 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the development of a "what mortgage applicants need to know" pamphlet on residential mortgages and provides such pamphlet shall be posted and printed in the 6 most common non-English languages spoken by individuals with limited English proficiency in New York state.
Title
Requires the development of a "what mortgage applicants need to know" pamphlet on residential mortgages and provides such pamphlet shall be posted and printed in the 6 most common non-English languages spoken by individuals with limited English proficiency in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.85 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.242 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.242 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | print number 1845b |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | print number 1845a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S05390 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BANKS