NY A01859 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.682
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.682
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "zombie property remediation act of 2019".
Title
Enacts the "zombie property remediation act of 2019".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.682 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.326 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a1859a |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.884 |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5079A |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5079a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.326 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.326 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | print number 1859a |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05079 (Same As) 2019-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.682