NY A01878 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s3065b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s3065b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the residential structure fire prevention act of 2018; provides a tax credit to homeowners who remove cock loft fire hazards in their homes; provides an insurance discount for the installation of smoke detecting alarm devices in cock lofts; provides that the repair of cock lofts for the purpose of fire prevention and safety shall be qualifying expenditures under state housing programs.
Title
Enacts the residential structure fire prevention act of 2018; provides a tax credit to homeowners who remove cock loft fire hazards in their homes; provides an insurance discount for the installation of smoke detecting alarm devices in cock lofts; provides that the repair of cock lofts for the purpose of fire prevention and safety shall be qualifying expenditures under state housing programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3065b |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.271 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.271 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | print number 1878b |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-10-25 | Assembly | print number 1878a |
2017-10-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03065 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.308