NY A01889 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - substituted by s2135a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - substituted by s2135a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to agricultural custom operators.
Title
Relates to agricultural custom operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Assembly | substituted by s2135a |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.197 |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | print number 1889a |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S02135 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.282