NY A01922 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s2038a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s2038a
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.327
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.327
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-04-04Assemblyprint number 1922a
2019-04-04Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2019-01-18Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S02038 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback