NY A01931 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that every banking institution which maintains checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balance; provides such banks may dishonor check for insufficient funds, but then must honor smaller checks within amounts on deposit in the subject account.
Title
Provides that every banking institution which maintains checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balance; provides such banks may dishonor check for insufficient funds, but then must honor smaller checks within amounts on deposit in the subject account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | committed to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.88 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.385 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S00982 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to codes