NY A01940 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of authorized withdrawal transactions at no charge from basic banking accounts for account holders sixty-five years of age or older from eight to twelve.
Title
Increases the number of authorized withdrawal transactions at no charge from basic banking accounts for account holders sixty-five years of age or older from eight to twelve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.260 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.414 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2245 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.283 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S02245 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.260