NY A01945 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - signed chap.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - signed chap.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a time period in which an action to recover damages for injury arising from domestic violence must be brought.
Title
Establishes a time period in which an action to recover damages for injury arising from domestic violence must be brought.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-04 | Senate | signed chap.245 |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.186 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2416 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.58 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02416 (Same As) 2019-09-04 - signed chap.245