NY A01948 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain persons engaged in the construction and demolition industries to complete a safety training program.
Title
Requires certain persons engaged in the construction and demolition industries to complete a safety training program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 1948a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to labor |