NY A01957 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawfully installing a gas meter; makes it a class B misdemeanor.
Title
Relates to unlawfully installing a gas meter; makes it a class B misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 1957a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01054 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - referred to codes