NY A01961 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-16 - print number 1961a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-16 - print number 1961a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the right to legal counsel in immigration court proceedings; provides for the administration thereof.
Title
Establishes the right to legal counsel in immigration court proceedings; provides for the administration thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Assembly | print number 1961a |
2022-09-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00081 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - PRINT NUMBER 81B