NY A01967 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6050
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes acts of domestic violence in the criteria the court shall consider in determining the equitable disposition of property during divorce proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes acts of domestic violence in the criteria the court shall consider in determining the equitable disposition of property during divorce proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6050
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.584
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.584
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06050 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.584

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback