NY A02029 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notices pertaining to children's non-regulated camp.
Title
Relates to notices pertaining to children's non-regulated camp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.103 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.68 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a2029 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1233 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s1140 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.68 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.68 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01140 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.103