NY A02037 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of public service to study the feasibility of a municipal broadband program within the state.
Title
Directs the department of public service to study the feasibility of a municipal broadband program within the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.190 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.98 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | substituted for a2037a |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1173 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6041A |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s6041a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.98 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.98 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | print number 2037a |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06041 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.190