NY A02039 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - substituted by s4738
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - substituted by s4738
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to modular construction work; provides that modular construction shall comply with any existing municipal licensing requirements for all electrical, plumbing, and fire suppression work.
Title
Relates to modular construction work; provides that modular construction shall comply with any existing municipal licensing requirements for all electrical, plumbing, and fire suppression work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Assembly | substituted by s4738 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.247 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04738 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.180