NY A02040 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from prospective employees; establishes a public awareness campaign.
Title
Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from prospective employees; establishes a public awareness campaign.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.153 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.470 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.470 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | print number 2040c |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | print number 2040b |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | print number 2040a |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00024 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S05532 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S06737 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
S05532 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S06737 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR