NY A02047 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on December 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.619
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on December 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.619
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the change of name of any independent body making nominations.
Title
Prohibits the change of name of any independent body making nominations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.619 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.387 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a2047a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1355 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5974A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5974a |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.387 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | print number 2047a |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05974 (Same As) 2019-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.619