NY A02048 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the task force on social innovation, entrepreneurship and enterprise to study and report on developing and sustaining socially innovative programs and businesses.
Title
Establishes the task force on social innovation, entrepreneurship and enterprise to study and report on developing and sustaining socially innovative programs and businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] |
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Patrick Burke [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | print number 2048a |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00479 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN