NY A02062 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all incarcerated individuals who do not have a high-school diploma or its equivalent to receive a reading proficiency-level assessment and dyslexia screening upon intake; requires for such individuals who perform below a certain proficiency level to be provided with dyslexia intervention that is evidence-based effective and consistent with science-based research specifically tailored to addressing dyslexia.
Title
Requires all incarcerated individuals who do not have a high-school diploma or its equivalent to receive a reading proficiency-level assessment and dyslexia screening upon intake; requires for such individuals who perform below a certain proficiency level to be provided with dyslexia intervention that is evidence-based effective and consistent with science-based research specifically tailored to addressing dyslexia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.91 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.100 |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00307 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE