NY A02076 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires places of public accommodation, resort or amusement that operate televisions during regular hours of operation to provide closed captioning on certain televisions upon request.
Title
Requires places of public accommodation, resort or amusement that operate televisions during regular hours of operation to provide closed captioning on certain televisions upon request.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.295 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.388 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | substituted for a2076 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.719 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s1650 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.388 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01650 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.295