NY A02080 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 2080a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 2080a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants each of the representatives of the counties of Dutchess, Putnam, Orange and Rockland a vote during the proceedings of the metropolitan transportation authority.
Title
Grants each of the representatives of the counties of Dutchess, Putnam, Orange and Rockland a vote during the proceedings of the metropolitan transportation authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | print number 2080a |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07376 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION