NY A02092 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.
Title
Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.72 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.541 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a2092b |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1687 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3985B |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3985A |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3985b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.541 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.541 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | print number 2092b |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 2092a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03985 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.72
A08352 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation
A08352 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation