NY A02100 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent certain provisions relating to citizenship requirements for permanent certification as a teacher.
Title
Makes permanent certain provisions relating to citizenship requirements for permanent certification as a teacher.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.422 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.488 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a2100 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1313 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4448 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.488 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.488 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04448 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.422