NY A02112 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.329
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.1450
2018-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3203A
2018-05-31SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2018-05-31Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.943
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-04-10Assemblyprint number 2112a
2018-04-10Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-17Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S03203 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2112A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02112&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02112&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02112
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02112&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02112A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02112&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02112&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02112&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2112#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback