NY A02115 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Title
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01875 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1875A