NY A02131 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-18)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.

Sponsors

Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]
Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Doug Smith [R]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]
Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R]Asm. Anthony Palumbo [R]
Asm. Michael LiPetri [R]Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Jo Simon [D]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-07Assemblyprint number 2131a
2019-02-07Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S03372 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 3372A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback