NY A02144 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - held for consideration in energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - held for consideration in energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the nodal metering initiative demonstration project.
Title
Establishes the nodal metering initiative demonstration project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | held for consideration in energy |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2011-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to energy |
2011-01-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03466 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS