NY A02144 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - print number 2144a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - print number 2144a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the trading of existing but unused research and development credits and existing but unused net operating loss deductions to existing corporations and partnerships in return for private assistance; enacts the "Small New York Based High-Technology Business Investment Tax Credit Act".
Title
Authorizes the trading of existing but unused research and development credits and existing but unused net operating loss deductions to existing corporations and partnerships in return for private assistance; enacts the "Small New York Based High-Technology Business Investment Tax Credit Act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Assembly | print number 2144a |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01472 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1472A