NY A02144 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.
Title
Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | recommitted to correction |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.159 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.388 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03351 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION