NY A02145 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of court administration to promulgate certain housing court documents in the seven most common languages in the city of New York.
Title
Requires the office of court administration to promulgate certain housing court documents in the seven most common languages in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.223 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.330 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a2145 |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.243 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1594 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s1951 |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.330 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01951 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.223