NY A02156 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions relating to self-employment assistance programs and other matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions relating to self-employment assistance programs and other matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1222
2019-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6020
2019-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.482
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S06020 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2156

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02156&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02156&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02156
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02156&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02156&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02156&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2156#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback